SC H4722 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 7-15-387 So As To Prohibit A Person From Knowingly Collecting Voted Or Unvoted Absentee Ballots, And To Provide A Penalty.
Title
Absentee voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0331 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Massey, McElveen, M.B.Matthews, Gambrell
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4722&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4722_20191120.htm |