SC H4722 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-05 - Act No. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reapportion The Specific Areas Or Election Districts From Which Members Of The Governing Body Of The Abbeville County School District Must Be Elected Beginning With School Trustee Elections In 2012, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts
Title
Abbeville County School District Trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Agnew [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-05 | Act No. 293 | |
2012-03-15 | Effective date 03/13/12 | |
2012-03-13 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-03-07 | Ratified R 147 | |
2012-02-22 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-02-21 | Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-02-08 | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-08 | Read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Debate adjourned until Wed., 02-08-12 | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |