SC H4718 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-55-130 So As To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Promulgate Regulations To Establish Maximum Contaminant Levels For Certain Pollutants In Public Water Systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pollutants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2020-03-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
2020-02-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary
2020-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel, King, Elliott
2020-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hayes
2020-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Govan, Morgan
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-11-20HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H5339 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4455130(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback