SC H4712 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Act No. 167
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Classify Off-premises Outdoor Advertising Signs As Personal Property And To Provide That Under Certain Circumstances An Off-premises Sign Site Must Be Taxed At Its Value Which Existed Before The Erection Of The Sign
Title
Agricultural real property, mobile home, and lessee improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Act No. 167 | |
2016-05-04 | Effective date 04/29/16 | |
2016-04-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-04-26 | Ratified R 173 | |
2016-04-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2016-04-21 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-23 | House | Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0995 (Similar To) 2016-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Finance