SC H4701 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "second Amendment Preservation Act" And To Provide That The State Shall Not Enforce Certain Laws, Rules, Or Regulations That Limit The Right Of A Person To Own, Possess, Or Use A Firearm, Ammunitions, Or Firearm Accessories, Accept Certain Federal Funds That Require Firearms To Be Registered Or Confiscated, Or Expend Any State Funds Toward The Enforcement Of Certain Federal Laws, Rules, Or Regulations That Require Firearms To Be Registered Or Confiscated.
Title
Second Amendment Preservation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Judiciary |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Bright, Gregory, Shealy, M.B.Matthews |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-30 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-69 Nays-27 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Rivers |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Limehouse, Clemmons |
2016-03-02 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Burns, G.R.Smith, Yow |
2016-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson, Hixon, Taylor |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hicks |
2016-02-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Newton, Rivers, Herbkersman, Bradley, Bowers, Finlay, Huggins |
2016-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0125 (Similar To) 2015-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4628 (Similar To) 2016-05-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
H4668 (Similar To) 2016-05-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
H4628 (Similar To) 2016-05-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
H4668 (Similar To) 2016-05-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers