SC H4700 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 60-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Rules of the House of Representatives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - House - House: Adoption Of House Resolution (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-28-16 |
2016-01-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Rules |
2016-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Delleney, Whitmire, Brannon, Bingham |
2016-01-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: White, Norman, Felder, McCoy, Corley, Willis, Thayer, Long, Spires, Bradley, Sandifer, Gambrell, H.A.Crawford, Putnam, Rivers, Horne, Newton, Gagnon, Southard, Ryhal, Hardee, Duckworth, Johnson, Lowe, Fry, Erickson |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced |