SC H4700 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 305
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 305
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO PROVIDE FOR AN ADVISORY REFERENDUM TO BE HELD AT THE SAME TIME AS THE 2010 GENERAL ELECTION TO DETERMINE WHETHER OR NOT THE QUALIFIED ELECTORS OF DILLON COUNTY FAVOR HAVING THE DILLON COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION ELECTED. - ratified title
Title
Provide For An Advisory Referendum To Be Held At The Same Time As The 2010 General Election To Determine Whether Or Not The Qualified Electors Of Dillon County Favor Having The Dillon County Board Of Education Elected. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 305 | |
2010-05-21 | Effective date 05/11/10 | |
2010-05-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Ratified R 204 | |
2010-04-16 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-1 | |
2010-04-15 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day SJ-16 | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time SJ-16 | |
2010-04-14 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-56 | |
2010-04-14 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-24 | |
2010-04-13 | Read second time HJ-33 | |
2010-03-11 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, March 30, 2010 HJ-7 | |
2010-03-11 | Reconsidered HJ-7 | |
2010-03-10 | Read second time HJ-8 | |
2010-03-09 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-4 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4700&session=118 |