SC H4695 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 33-31-1040 SO AS TO PROVIDE FOR THE MANNER IN WHICH A NONPROFIT CORPORATION MAY CONVERT TO A FOR PROFIT CORPORATION; BY ADDING SECTION 33-31-1045 SO AS TO PROVIDE FURTHER CONDITIONS FOR THE CONVERSION OF A PUBLIC BENEFIT OR RELIGIOUS CORPORATION TO A FOR PROFIT CORPORATION; AND TO AMEND SECTION 33-1-200, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO FILING REQUIREMENTS UNDER THE BUSINESS CORPORATION ACT, SO AS TO ADD A REFERENCE TO THE CHAPTER ON NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS.
Title
Add A Reference To The Chapter On Nonprofit Corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Cleary, Williams, Mulvaney, Nicholson | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-15 | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced and read first time SJ-15 | |
2010-04-30 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-1 | |
2010-04-29 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-37 | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time HJ-37 | |
2010-04-28 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, April 29, 2010 HJ-81 | |
2010-04-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-04-22 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-82 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-119 | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced and read first time HJ-119 |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 31 | 1040 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 31 | 1045 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4695&session=118 |