SC H4688 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Raise The Awareness Of The Bradley Blake Foundation Surrounding The Issue Of Gun Violence And To Declare The Month Of June 2018 "gun Violence Awareness Month".
Title
Gun Violence Awareness Month
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. William Crosby [R] | Rep. Joseph Daning [R] | Rep. Patsy Knight [D] |
Rep. Wendy Brawley [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-02-13 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2018-02-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-13-18 |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced |