SC H4686 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 16-11-440 And 16-11-450, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Both Relating To Immunity From Criminal Prosecution And Civil Actions Under Certain Circumstances For The Use Of Deadly Force Against Another Person (stand Your Ground), Both So As To Include Displaying Deadly Force In The Purview Of The Statutes.
Title
Immunity from prosecution and civil action for stand your ground
Sponsors
Rep. Mandy Kimmons [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Sylleste Davis [R] |
Rep. Ashley Trantham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham |
2020-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4686&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4686_20191120.htm |