SC H4682 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Filing Of A Bond And The Filing Of A Certificate Of Deposit Of Money Or Securities As Methods Of Establishing Proof Of Financial Responsibility; And To Repeal Sections 56-9-570 And 56-9-580 Both Relating To Establishing Proof Of Financial Responsibility By The Filing Of A Bond Or A Certificate Of Deposit Of Money Or Securities.
Title
Proof of financial responsibility methods
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Willis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 9 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 9 | 570 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 9 | 580 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |