SC H4675 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bannister, B.Cox, Willis, Trantham
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-37-220, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Exemptions From Property Tax, So As To Exempt All Property Devoted To Housing Low Income Residents If The Property Is Owned By An Instrumentality Of A Nonprofit Housing Corporation Or Owned By An Entity That Provides Low Income Housing And Is Controlled By An Instrumentality Of A Nonprofit Housing Corporation; And To Amend Section 31-3-570, Relating To The Tax Exemption For The Property Of A Housing Authority, So As To Include Property Owned By An Entity That Provides Low Income Housing And Is Controlled By An Instrumentality Of A Housing Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bannister, B.Cox, Willis, Trantham
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
2020-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-11-20HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H4344 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1237220(n/a)See Bill Text
313570(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback