SC H4674 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 6-1-530, 6-1-730, And 6-4-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The Expenditure Of The State Accommodations Tax, Local Hospitality Tax, And Local Accommodations Tax, Respectively, All So As To Allow The Revenue To Be Expended For The Control And Repair Of Flooding And Drainage At Tourism-related Lands Or Areas.
Title
Accommodations and hospitality tax expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-11-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-11-20 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0217 (Similar To) 2020-10-02 - Act No. 146
H3132 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
H3132 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 1 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 1 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4674&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/4674_20191120.htm |