SC H4665 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Act No. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Requirements For The Investigation Of A Complaint
Title
Childcare facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 26 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 26 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Act No. 295 | |
2014-07-08 | Effective date 06/23/14 | |
2014-06-23 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-06-20 | Ratified R 329 | |
2014-06-19 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Conference report adopted |
2014-06-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-114 Nays-0 |
2014-06-17 | House | Conference report received and adopted |
2014-06-05 | House | Conference committee appointed Alexander, Erickson, HA Crawford |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Cleary, Coleman, Shealy |
2014-06-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-95 |
2014-06-05 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Amended |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Amended |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-05-01 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-30 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2014-04-30 | House | Amended |
2014-04-30 | House | Reconsidered |
2014-04-30 | House | Committed to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-30-14 |
2014-04-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-29-14 |
2014-04-09 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2014-04-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-9-14 |
2014-04-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-8-14 |
2014-04-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-3-14 |
2014-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0841 (Similar To) 2014-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 13 | 185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 13 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 13 | 840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |