SC H4663 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 40-43-190, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Protocol For Pharmacists To Administer Influenza Vaccines Without The Order Of A Practitioner, So As To Provide Pharmacists May Administer Influenza Vaccines To Persons Under Twelve Years Of Age Pursuant To Protocol Issued By The Board Of Medical Examiners Upon Recommendation Of The Joint Pharmacist Administered Vaccines Committee. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flu vaccine protocol for pharmacists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02 Act No. 158
2020-10-02 Effective date 09/28/20
2020-09-28 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 181
2020-09-17SenateRead third time and enrolled
2020-09-16SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-09-16SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-1
2020-09-16SenateRead second time
2020-09-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2020-03-04SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2020-03-04SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-04HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-03-03HouseRoll call Yeas-96 Nays-8
2020-03-03HouseRead second time
2020-03-03HouseAmended
2020-02-26HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-27-20
2020-02-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
2020-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-11-20HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4043190(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback