SC H4657 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That An Applicant For Licensure As An Administrator Must Provide Certain Financial Statements And Reports And Require The Submission Of A Surety Bond For The Renewal Of An Administrator's License

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance, Health Maintenance Organizations, penalties for violations of state and federal laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 219
2018-05-25 Effective date 05/18/18
2018-05-18 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 259
2018-05-08SenateRead third time and enrolled
2018-05-01SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2018-05-01SenateRead second time
2018-04-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
2018-02-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-15HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-14HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2018-02-14HouseRead second time
2018-02-14HouseAmended
2018-02-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381370(n/a)See Bill Text
38210(n/a)See Bill Text
3821290(n/a)See Bill Text
383150(n/a)See Bill Text
3833170(n/a)See Bill Text
3833230(n/a)See Bill Text
385120(n/a)See Bill Text
385130(n/a)See Bill Text
386120(n/a)See Bill Text
387190(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback