SC H4655 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 171
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Define Necessary Terms; To Require A Licensee To Develop, Implement, And Maintain A Comprehensive Information Security Program Based On The Licensee's Risk Assessment And To Establish Certain Requirements For The Security Program, To Provide Minimum Requirements For A Licensee's Board Of Directors, If Applicable, To Require A Licensee To Monitor The Security Program And Make Adjustments If Necessary, To Provide That The Licensee Must Establish An Incident Response Plan And To Establish Certain Requirements For The Incident Response Plan, To Require A Licensee To Submit A Statement To The Director Of The Department Of Insurance Annually; To Establish Certain Requirements For A Licensee In The Event Of A Cybersecurity Event; To Require A Licensee To Notify The Director Of Certain Information In The Event Of A Cybersecurity Event; To Grant The Director The Power And Authority To Examine And Investigate A Licensee; To Provide That Documents, Materials, Or Other Information In The Control Or Possession Of The Department Must Be Treated As Confidential And To Authorize The Director To Share Or Receive Confidential Documents Under Certain Circumstances; To Provide Exemptions From The Provisions Of This Chapter; To Provide Penalties For Violations; And To Authorize The Director To Promulgate Regulations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Insurance Data Security Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14 Act No. 171
2018-05-11 Effective date 01/01/19
2018-05-03 Signed By Governor
2018-05-01 Ratified R 184
2018-04-18SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2018-04-18SenateRead third time and enrolled
2018-03-22SenateRead second time
2018-02-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-07 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-06HouseRoll call Yeas-105 Nays-2
2018-02-06HouseRead second time
2018-02-06HouseAmended
2018-02-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0856 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback