SC H4643 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establish That A Direct Primary Care Agreement Is Not A Contract Of Insurance And Not Subject To Regulation By The Department Of Insurance, And To Define The Term Direct Primary Care Agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct primary care agreement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-15HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-14HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2018-02-14HouseRead second time
2018-02-14HouseAmended
2018-02-13HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-23HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0276 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
H3546 (Similar To) 2017-02-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole, Hill

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
386180(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback