SC H4635 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guffey
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guffey
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 38-77-285 So As To Provide Automobile Insurance Appraisers And Insurers May Not Require Insureds To Use Certain Facilities To Repair Or Replace Damaged Automobile Safety Glass, And To Provide Penalties For Violations, Among Other Things.
Title
Automobile glass repair insurance coverage
Sponsors
Rep. Joe White [R] | Rep. Raye Felder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guffey |
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4635&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/4635_20231116.htm |