SC H4630 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 206
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide An Exemption When The Employment Is Discontinued Because Of His Absence From Work Due To A Disability He Sustained In That Employment For Which He Receives Workers' Compensation Benefits And From Which He Has Not Been Authorized To Return To Work Without Restriction To Require He Satisfy Continuing Education Requirements Of This Period; And To Make These Provisions Retroactive To January 1, 2013
Title
Law enforcement certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Act No. 206 | |
2014-06-06 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 259 | |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), McElveen, Turner |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-1 |
2014-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2014-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |