SC H4628 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Telephone Privacy Protection Act"; To Define Relevant Terms; To Prohibit Telephone Solicitors From Initiating Or Causing To Be Initiated A Telephone Solicitation During Certain Hours Of The Day And To Provide Exceptions; To Require Telephone Solicitors To Disclose Certain Information At The Outset Of A Telephone Solicitation, Including The Consumer's Right To Be Added To The Telephone Solicitor's In-house "do Not Call List" Upon Request; To Prohibit A Person, With Fraudulent Or Other Specified Intent, From Making Or Initiating A Telephone Call Or Text Message Or Engaging In Conduct That Results In The Display Of Misleading, False, Or Inaccurate Caller Identification Information; To Require Telephone Solicitors To Play Certain Prerecorded Identifications And Opt-out Messages Under Certain Circumstances; To Prohibit A Person From Initiating Or Causing To Be Initiated A Telephone Solicitation Directed To A Telephone Number When A Person At That Telephone Number Previously Stated A Desire Not To Be Contacted, And To Prohibit Telephone Solicitors From Initiating Or Causing To Be Initiated A Telephone Solicitation To A Telephone Number On The National Do Not Call Registry; To Provide Remedies For Violations; To Authorize The Administrator Of The Department Of Consumer Affairs To Issue Administrative Orders Requiring A Person To Cease And Desist, Or Return Property Or Money Received In Violation Of This Act, To Impose Penalties, And To Authorize The Attorney General To Investigate And Enforce Alleged Violations Of This Act; To Provide That Nothing In This Act May Be Construed To Limit Other Remedies Available Under Federal Or State Law; And To Delete Section 16-17-445
Title
Telephone Privacy Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 218 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 258 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-20 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-1 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott, Duckworth |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson |
2018-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2018-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0996 (Similar To) 2018-02-13 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
H4724 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
H4724 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry