SC H4624 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Special order, set for Aprl 25, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Special order, set for Aprl 25, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 42 To Title 44 So As To Define Gender, Sex, And Other Terms, To Prohibit The Provision Of Gender Transition Procedures To A Person Under Eighteen Years Of Age, To Provide Exceptions, To Prohibit The Use Of Public Funds For Gender Transition Procedures, And To Provide Penalties; And By Adding Section 59-32-36 So As To Prohibit Public School Staff And Officials From Withholding Knowledge Of A Minor's Perception Of Their Gender From The Minor's Parents, Among Other Things.
Title
Gender Reassignment Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 82 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 14 Amendment Number 14 (Y: 83 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 13 Amendment Number 13 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 12 Amendment Number 12 (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 11 Amendment Number 11 (Y: 79 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 10 Amendment Number 10 (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 9 Amendment Number 9 (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To Judiciary (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 7 Amendment Number 7 (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 6 Amendment Number 6 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 83 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 78 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 82 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 14 Amendment Number 14 (Y: 83 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 13 Amendment Number 13 (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 12 Amendment Number 12 (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 11 Amendment Number 11 (Y: 79 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 10 Amendment Number 10 (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 9 Amendment Number 9 (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit To Judiciary (Y: 80 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 7 Amendment Number 7 (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 6 Amendment Number 6 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 5 Amendment Number 5 (Y: 83 N: 28 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 78 N: 31 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 82 N: 29 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House: Table Amendment 2 Amendment Number 2 (Y: 81 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Special order, set for Aprl 25, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-01-18 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-01-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-23 |
2024-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Amended |
2024-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Bradley, Erickson, Gibson, Blackwell, M.M.Smith |
2024-01-16 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pace |
2024-01-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis, Ligon, Forrest |
2024-01-11 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2024-01-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Landing, Ballentine, Sandifer, Crawford, Guest |
2024-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Nutt, Haddon, Burns, Chumley, Murphy, Mitchell, Brewer, Robbins, Gatch, West, Gilliam, Cromer, Kilmartin, O'Neal, Yow, S.Jones |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |