SC H4617 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name Lake Street (s-30-145) In Laurens County "bill Ramey Way" And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers Along This Highway Containing These Words.
Title
Bill Ramey Way
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-04-20 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced |
2021-11-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2021-11-17 | House | Prefiled |