SC H4604 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide An Exemption For Certain Activities Performed By Full-time Employees Or Other Personnel Of A Manufacturing Company, And To Define Necessary Terms
Title
Engineering, licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Act No. 157 | |
2014-04-21 | Effective date 04/14/14 | |
2014-04-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-04-10 | Ratified R 172 | |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0996 (Similar To) 2014-02-05 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry