SC H4602 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Tax May Be Imposed To Defray Debt Obligations Of The School District And Thereby Reducing Property Taxes, To Allow The Referendum To Include A Separate Question On The Authorization Of General Obligation Bonds Pursuant To The Constitutional Exemption, To Provide The Form Of The Question, And To Change The Timing Of A Reimposition Referendum To No Earlier Than Within The Calendar Year Which Is Two Years Before The Calendar Year In Which The Tax Is Scheduled To Terminate.
Title
Education Capital Improvement Sales and Use Tax Act
Sponsors
Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. Robert Brown [D] | Rep. Michael Sottile [R] |
Rep. David Mack [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-11 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-10 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2014-04-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-1 |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-10 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |