SC H4600 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Act No. 169
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Add A Definition For "community Distributor"
Title
Opioid antidote, prescriptions to community organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Act No. 169 | |
2018-05-11 | Effective date 05/03/18 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-01 | Ratified R 182 | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2018-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-20 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |