SC H4591 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Business Owned By A Service-disabled Veteran Residing In This State Shall Receive A Five Percent Preference Through The Use Of Set-asides On Contract Awards Where The Awarding Procurement Officer Determines The Business Is Otherwise Qualified To Perform The Requirements Of The Contract.
Title
Resident vendor preferences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 10 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-5-18 |
2018-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Ridgeway |
2018-03-21 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18 |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |