SC H4590 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 7-13-25, Relating To Early Voting, So As To Extend The Hours Of Operation Of Early Voting Centers.
Title
Early voting hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-3 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Henderson-Myers |
2024-02-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Robbins, Murphy, Brewer, Gatch |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |