SC H4589 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 5-15-120, Relating To Vote Counting In Municipal Elections, So As To Delete Language Providing That Incumbents Hold Over Pending Final Determination Of Any Contests Filed; And By Amending Section 5-15-140, Relating To Appeals From Decisions Regarding Municipal Election Contests, So As To Delete Language Providing That A Notice Of Appeal Acts As A Stay Of Further Proceedings, And To Provide That Appeals Are To Be Given First Priority Of Consideration By The Court Of Common Pleas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal election protests

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-05SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2024-03-05SenateIntroduced and read first time
2024-02-29HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2024-02-29HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2024-02-29HouseRead second time
2024-02-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler
2024-02-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2024-01-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Robbins, Murphy, Brewer, Gatch
2024-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2024-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time
2023-11-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2023-11-16HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515120(n/a)See Bill Text
515140(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback