SC H4580 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Any Home Or Facility Approved And Annually Reviewed By The United States Department Of Veterans Affairs As A Medical Foster Home In Which Care Is Provided Exclusively To Three Or Fewer Veterans Are Exempt From The Provisions Of Chapter 7, Title 44 In Regard To Hospitals, Nursing Homes, And Other Facilities Required To Be Licensed By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control
Title
Medical Foster Home Program for veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D] | Rep. Harold Mitchell [D] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] |
Rep. Craig Gagnon [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 232 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 266 | |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2016-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-14 | House | Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Gilliard, Gagnon, Williams |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0910 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs