SC H4573 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Boundaries Of The Seven Single-member Districts From Which Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of The School District Of Fairfield County Are Elected.
Title
Fairfield County School District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2014-02-19 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-02-06 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Fairfield Delegation |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Fairfield Delegation |
2014-02-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1002 (Similar To) 2014-09-08 - Act No. 306