SC H4551 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require That No Gun Transfer Preceded By A Criminal Background Check May Proceed, Unless The Criminal Background Check Has Concluded That The Sale May Proceed, Until At Least Twenty-eight Days Have Passed From The Initiation Of The Background Check, And To Provide For Criminal Penalties For Violations Of This Article.
Title
Background Checks for Firearm Sales and Transfers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0917 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4552 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0918 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4552 (Similar To) 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4551&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4551_20151210.htm |