SC H4546 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Board To Introduce, Examine, And Cross-examine Witnesses; And For Other Purposes
Title
Definitions in Children's Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Act No. 238 | |
2016-06-10 | Effective date 06/05/16 | |
2016-06-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 264 | |
2016-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Young (ch), McElveen, Shealy |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2016-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-26 | House | Amended |
2016-04-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Willis, Bedingfield |
2016-04-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-04-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-05-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, Clary, Erickson, Long, Ryhal, Herbkersman, Newton, Jordan, Hicks, McCoy, M.S.McLeod, Douglas, Henegan, Allison, Quinn, Funderburk |
2016-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 11 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 750 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 2310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |