SC H4542 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 9 To Chapter 5, Title 39 So As To Provide Definitions, To Provide That A Covered Platform Operator May Not Upload Or Allow A User To Upload Certain Pornographic Images Without Certain Verification, To Provide That A Covered Platform Operator Must Establish Certain Procedures, To Provide That Certain Images May Not Be Uploaded Without Consent, To Provide For Civil Penalties, To Provide For Criminal Penalties, To Establish A Legislative Committee, And To Provide That The Attorney General Shall Create Certain Consent Forms.
Title
Online technological exploitation
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Guffey [R] | Rep. Ashley Trantham [R] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Rep. Raye Felder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-12-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-16 | House | Prefiled |