SC H4538 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 50-1-320 So As To Prohibit The Unlawful Removal Or Destruction Of An Electronic Collar Or Other Electronic Device Placed On A Dog By Its Owner To Maintain Control Of The Dog.
Title
Dog control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2022-04-20 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-20 | House | Amended |
2022-04-19 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-04-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-19-22 |
2022-04-05 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-31 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-30 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-29 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-10 | House | Debate adjourned |
2022-03-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-9-22 |
2022-03-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-8-22 |
2022-03-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thurs., 3-3-22 |
2022-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-2-22 |
2022-02-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-1-22 |
2022-02-23 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-24-22 |
2022-02-17 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-23-22 |
2022-02-16 | House | Debate adjourned until Thu., 2-17-22 |
2022-02-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-16-22 |
2022-02-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-15-22 |
2022-02-08 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-9-22 |
2022-02-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-8-22 |
2022-02-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-3-22 |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Hixon |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-11-10 | House | Prefiled |