SC H4517 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Membership Of The Commission And Change The Commission's Process For Nominating Judicial Candidates From The Nomination Of Three Qualified Candidates To The Release Of A List Of All Qualified Candidates To The General Assembly.
Title
Judicial Merit Selection Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Pope [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. James Merrill [R] | Rep. William Chumley [R] |
Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Merita Allison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3979 (Similar To) 2015-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S1004 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S1004 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4517&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4517_20151203.htm |