SC H4513 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defend Natural Marriage As Between One Man And One Woman, To Invalidate Court Decisions To The Contrary, To Require The South Carolina Attorney General To Defend State Officials In Lawsuits Related To The State's Definition Of Marriage, To Prohibit Enforcement Of Court Decisions Contrary To South Carolina's Laws, And To Protect Government Officials From Arrest Or Other Penalties For Noncompliance With Unlawful Court Orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Carolina Natural Marriage Defense Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss
2016-01-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith
2016-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2015-12-03HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-12-03HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20117(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback