SC H4504 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduce From Thirty Days To Twenty-five Days Before The Election The Deadline For Voter Registration.
Title
Voting registration books
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D] | Rep. William Cogswell [R] | Rep. Leola Robinson-Simpson [D] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] |
Rep. Mandy Norrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Norrell |
2018-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 15 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 7 | 990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4504&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4504_20171213.htm |