SC H4499 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Remove The One Dollar Fee Charged By The Department Of Motor Vehicles For The Placement Of A Veteran Designation On A Driver's License.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Unanimous consent for second reading on next legislative day |
2014-04-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2014-04-03 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0576 (Similar To) 2013-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Transportation