SC H4494 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove The Requirement That The Purchase Be Made From A Contiguous State; And To Repeal Article 3, Chapter 31, Title 23 Relating To The Regulation Of Pistols
Title
Purchase of rifles or shotguns in contiguous states
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] |
Rep. Garry Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Act No. 285 | |
2012-07-17 | Effective date 06/29/12 | |
2012-06-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified R 327 | |
2012-06-27 | Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-2 | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2012-06-07 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-06-07 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-07 | Amended | |
2012-06-06 | Read second time | |
2012-06-05 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-03 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Knotts, Campbell, Coleman, Shoopman | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-03-28 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 | |
2012-03-27 | Read second time | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, Bedingfield | |
2012-03-06 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-11-29 | Prefiled |