SC H4493 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Department Of Social Services To Give First Consideration To Certain Foster Parents To Adopt Foster Children.
Title
Adoption of foster children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay |
2016-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins, Clary, Erickson, Long, Ryhal, Herbkersman, Tinkler, Hicks, McCoy, M.S.McLeod, Douglas, Henegan, Allison, Quinn, Funderburk |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4493&session=121&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4493_20151203.htm |