SC H4491 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit The Department From Contracting With Entities That Perform Or Promote Abortions With Exceptions.
Title
DHHS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Loftis, Herbkersman, Crawford, S.Rivers, Putnam, Pitts |
2018-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott, Magnuson, Long, Chumley, Elliott, Allison, Hamilton, Bedingfield, G.M.Smith, Willis, Martin, Sandifer, Whitmire, Tallon, Delleney, Bannister, Erickson |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4491&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/4491_20171213.htm |