SC H4487 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate Enforcement Of Drug Laws As A Function Of Dhec; And To Repeal Section 44-53-560 Relating To The Transfer Of Agents From Dhec To Sled
Title
Controlled substances, scheduling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 216 | |
2018-05-25 | Effective date 05/18/18 | |
2018-05-18 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 255 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-04-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-23 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-03-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-22 | House | Amended |
2018-03-22 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2018-03-21 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-03-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18 |
2018-03-20 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2018-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, West, Atwater, Erickson, Norrell, Weeks, Douglas, Ridgeway, Dillard, Huggins |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 53 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 480 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |