SC H4485 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate Health Advisory Boards And Change Certain Terminology; And To Repeal Article 3, Chapter 3, Title 44 Relating To The Catawba Health District.
Title
DHEC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-2 |
2018-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 1 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 1 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 1 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |