SC H4484 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Juncture Of Augusta Highway (sc 61) And Sidney's Road (s-21) In Colleton County "gruber's Crossroads", And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection That Contain The Words "gruber's Crossroads".
Title
Gruber's Crossroads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-23 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced |