SC H4482 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide For Certain Housing Attainability Protections, To Provide Definitions, To Provide That A County Or Municipality That Intends To Adopt An Ordinance That May Increase Or Decrease Certain Housing Costs Shall Prepare A Housing Impact Analysis, To Provide That A State Agency That Intends To Promulgate An Ordinance That May Increase Or Decrease Certain Housing Costs Shall Prepare A Housing Impact Analysis, To Provide The Unit Shall Prepare A Report Concerning The Unit's Implementation Of The Housing Plans Included In Its Comprehensive Plan, To Provide The Unit Shall Prepare A Report Concerning The Unit's Residential Development Fees, And To Provide That The Housing Authority Shall Prepare A Comprehensive Five-year State Housing Strategy Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Attainability Protection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill, Kirby, Henderson-Myers, Brawley, Cobb-Hunter, Robinson, Moore, Hewitt, Henegan, McDaniel, Ligon
2019-05-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Anderson, Garvin, Hosey, Ott
2019-05-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Simmons, Gilliard
2019-05-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Williams, Rivers, Clyburn
2019-04-25HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback