SC H4482 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Act No. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designate The Columbian Mammoth As The Official State Fossil

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Official State Fossil

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate: To Recede From Senate Amendments (Y: 13 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 30 N: 72 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-02 Act No. 177
2014-05-27 Effective date 05/16/14
2014-05-16 Signed By Governor
2014-05-15 Ratified R 194
2014-05-13HouseOrdered enrolled for ratification
2014-05-13SenateRoll call Ayes-32 Nays-3
2014-05-13SenateConference report adopted
2014-05-13SenateConference report received
2014-05-08HouseConference report received and adopted
2014-04-30HouseConference committee appointed Owens, Hixon, Ridgeway
2014-04-30SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Bryant, Johnson, Turner
2014-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-30 Nays-72
2014-04-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2014-04-03SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2014-04-02SenateRoll call Ayes-35 Nays-0
2014-04-02SenateRead second time
2014-04-03SenateAmended
2014-04-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-04-01SenateAmended
2014-03-25SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2014-03-19SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2014-02-20SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Johnson (ch), Bennett, Turner
2014-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2014-02-20HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2014-02-19HouseRoll call Yeas-94 Nays-3
2014-02-19HouseRead second time
2014-02-19HouseAmended
2014-02-18HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 2-19-14
2014-02-06HouseRecalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
2014-01-23HouseCommitted to Committee on Education and Public Works
2014-01-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2014-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0854 (Similar To) 2014-02-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Johnson (ch), Bennett, Turner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11691(n/a)See Bill Text
11712(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4482&session=120&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140114.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140122.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140206.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140319.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140325.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140401.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140402.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140402a.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4482_20140513.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7050
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7693
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7759
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7908
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=8007
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=8025

Bill Comments 750

feedback