SC H4479 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-8
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-8
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 12-6-1140, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO DEDUCTIONS FROM SOUTH CAROLINA TAXABLE INCOME OF INDIVIDUALS FOR PURPOSES OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA INCOME TAX ACT, SO AS TO INCLUDE DETENTION OFFICERS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS PERSONNEL WITHIN THE CATEGORY OF LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS ELIGIBLE TO CLAIM THE EIGHT DOLLARS A DAY SUBSISTENCE ALLOWANCE DEDUCTION FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS, FIRE FIGHTERS, AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICE PERSONNEL.
Title
Include Detention Officers And Telecommunications Personnel Within The Category Of Law Enforcement Officers Eligible To Claim The Eight Dollars A Day Subsistence Allowance Deduction For Law Enforcement Officers, Fire Fighters, And Emergency Medical Service Personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R] | Rep. Dennis Moss [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] |
Rep. Thad Viers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-8 | |
2010-03-10 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 | |
2010-03-10 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-31 | |
2010-03-09 | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1 HJ-51 | |
2010-03-09 | Read second time HJ-51 | |
2010-03-09 | Amended HJ-51 | |
2010-03-09 | Reconsidered HJ-25 | |
2010-03-04 | Debate adjourned on the motion to reconsider until Tuesday, March 9 HJ-18 | |
2010-03-03 | Motion noted- Rep. Clemmons moved to reconsider the vote whereby rejected HJ-113 | |
2010-03-03 | Roll call Yeas-41 Nays-67 HJ-31 | |
2010-03-03 | Rejected HJ-31 | |
2010-02-25 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, March 2, 2010 HJ-37 | |
2010-02-24 | Debate adjourned HJ-29 | |
2010-02-17 | Debate adjourned HJ-189 | |
2010-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Viers | |
2010-02-16 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Clemmons, GR Smith, White, Hardwick, Hearn, Crawford, Lowe, GM Smith, Sandifer, MA Pitts, Erickson, Chalk, Bedingfield, and Hayes HJ-24 | |
2010-02-04 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, February 16, 2010 HJ-31 | |
2010-02-03 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, February 4, 2010 HJ-12 | |
2010-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: M.A.Pitts, D.C.Moss, Crawford | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-47 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4479&session=118 |