SC H4471 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Add Salvia Divinorum And Salvinorin A, Synthetic Cannabinoids, And Cathinones And Substituted Cathinones, Commonly Known As "bath Salts" To The List Of Schedule I Drugs.
Title
Bath Salts added to list of schedule 1 controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-11-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-11-29 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4515 (Similar To) 2012-01-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy
S1005 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Knotts, Campsen
S1005 (Similar To) 2012-01-09 - Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Ford, Knotts, Campsen
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4471&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/4471_20111129.htm |