SC H4466 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Rankin, Grooms
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Rankin, Grooms
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A County May Adopt An Ordinance That Regulates The Operation Of Certain Unlicensed Vehicles Upon The Public Streets And Highways Within Its Jurisdiction When The Vehicles Are Offered To The Public For Rental On A Daily, Weekly, Or Monthly Basis, And To Provide That Municipalities May Adopt A Similar Ordinance In The Absence Of County Ordinances.
Title
Unlicensed vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 26 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 26 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hutto, Rankin, Grooms |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-1 Nays-91 |
2018-05-10 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-04 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-04-04 | House | Amended |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-12-13 | House | Prefiled |